U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12040-nmc
  • Case Name: KAYLA MICHELLE POLL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [In forma pauperis (BNC)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 7 Individual (BNC)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-7]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately) (Court Event)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee (In forma pauperis)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Voluntary Petition 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.