U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01063-abl
  • Case Name: AMANDA DEMBY SWIFT, AS LIQUIDATING TRUSTEE OF THE v. ROYAL CARGO INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approving Verified Petition (Adv)]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Designation of Local Counsel (BK)]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC)]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Designation of Local Counsel (BK)]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC)]
  • April 09, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-docket of online payment]
  • April 09, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Designation of Local Counsel (BK)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.