U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12039-nmc
  • Case Name: TRAVIS ZANE WEBER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Stipulated/Agreed Order (Bk)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Creditor Request for Notice (Batch) (Creditors)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Auto-docket of online payment]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Voluntary Petition 7]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.