U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00343
  • Case Name: Hernandez v. M.S.R.H.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint Amended]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice Change of Address]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Minute Order Terminate Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.