U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01430
  • Case Name: Harris v. Bernales et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.