U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00645
  • Case Name: Budget Truck Rental, LLC et al v. Estate Of Gary Lynn Muir et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Clerks Notice Reassign Judge]
  • April 29, 2025: [Minute Order Recusal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Summons to be issued]
  • April 11, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.