U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01469
  • Case Name: Board of Trustees of Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada et al v. World Wide Exhibits, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reconsider]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response]
  • April 16, 2025: [USCA Order Time Schedule]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appeal Case Number Assigned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice Appeal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Reconsider]
  • April 10, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.