U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00657
  • Case Name: Crescent City School of Gaming & Bartending, Inc. v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Petition for Removal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Clerks Notice Assign District Judge to Civil Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [General Orders regarding MJ assignment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Option to Decline MJ - FORM]
  • April 14, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 14, 2025: [Petition Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.