U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00654
  • Case Name: Sager, II v. Dr. Brawers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 15, 2025: [Clerks Notice Assign District Judge to Civil Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas]
  • April 14, 2025: [General Orders regarding MJ assignment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Option to Decline MJ - FORM]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.