U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12117-nmc
  • Case Name: LISMARY TAMAYO VALDES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [In forma pauperis (BNC)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filing (ADI)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee (In forma pauperis)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately) (Court Event)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Voluntary Petition 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.