U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00666
  • Case Name: San Tropez Associates, LLC et al v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice Corrected Image/Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition]
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 24, 2025: [QC Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.