U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00679
  • Case Name: Buckner v. Montana Brand Produce Company, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • May 01, 2025: [Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Show Cause]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice Attorney Action Required]
  • April 15, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 15, 2025: [Petition Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.