U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.