U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12215
  • Case Name: RAYMOND P. CASA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Certificate of Service of Chapter 13 Standing Trustee's Final Report and Account (Batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Chapter 13 Standing Trustee's Final Report and Account -Transferred]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Amended Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Amended Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (BNC)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Add Trustee]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Terminate Trustee]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Amended Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (BNC)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Hearing Sched/Resched (Confirmation Hearing-13)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Appointment of Successor/Interim Trustee -Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filing (ADI)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Chapter 13 Plan #1]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [122C-1 Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan #1]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [122C-1 Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Voluntary Petition - Chapter 13]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition - Chapter 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.