U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12249
  • Case Name: JESSICA MARIE CARDIEL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Statement of Intention]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Personal Financial Management Course]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 7 Individual (BNC)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-7]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Auto-docket of online payment]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Voluntary Petition 7]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition 7]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.