U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12248
  • Case Name: DERRICK LYNN WALKER, II and ZAKKIYAH THERESA JAMILAH WALKER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Hearing Sched/Resched (Confirmation Hearing-13)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Notice of Election to Accept the Presumptive Fee]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Confirmation Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Chapter 13 Plan #1]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-13]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 13 (BNC)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Auto-docket of online payment]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [122C-2 Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [122C-1 Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [122C-2 Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [122C-1 Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Voluntary Petition - Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition - Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.