U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00703
  • Case Name: Wacker v. Brown & Brown Insurance Services, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice Appearance of Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Clerks Notice Reassign Judge]
  • April 29, 2025: [Minute Order Recusal]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 21, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Petition Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.