U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12613-mkn
  • Case Name: ROBERTO ORTIZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Hearing Sched/Resched (Confirmation Hearing-13)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Shortening Time (Bk)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Confirmation Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Chapter 13 Plan #1]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Amended Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (BNC)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Terminate Trustee]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Add Trustee]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Attorney Information Sheet (Bk)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Attorney Information Sheet (Bk)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Order Shortening Time (Bk)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Order Shortening Time (Bk)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LEAVITT, KATHLEEN A. [Continue Stay Under 362(c)(3)(B)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Continue Stay Under 362(c)(3)(B)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Appointment of Successor/Interim Trustee -Chapter 13]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filing (ADI)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Auto-docket of online payment]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [122C-1 Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Chapter 13 Plan #1]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: YARNALL, RICK A. [Voluntary Petition - Chapter 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.