U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12620
  • Case Name: MATILDA AKRAM BINNA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Voluntary Petition (Amended)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 7 Individual (BNC)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-7]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filing (ADI)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Auto-docket of online payment]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-docket of online payment]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KROHN, SHELLEY D [Voluntary Petition 7]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.