U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12618-nmc
  • Case Name: TATIANA JANAE DUNN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer- (Form 2800)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [In forma pauperis (BNC)]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 7 Individual (BNC)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-7]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Amended Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset - Individual (BNC)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 7 Individual (BNC)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-7]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee (In forma pauperis)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately) (Court Event)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Voluntary Petition 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.