U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montalvo-Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • October 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • June 27, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • June 13, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 11, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 05, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 01, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 01, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 01, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.