U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 29, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Addendum]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 04, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 21, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 04, 2018: [Bail]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 01, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2018: [Bail Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • July 27, 2018: [Bail]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 19, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • July 19, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 07, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 05, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 04, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 04, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 04, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.