U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Espejo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • November 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • November 09, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • November 03, 2020: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
  • October 21, 2020: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • October 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 01, 2020: [Extend Time]
  • October 01, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 29, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [CJA 21 Payment Information]
  • July 12, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 29, 2019: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • May 28, 2019: [Response - not to motion]
  • May 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 17, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 12, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 04, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Objection - not to motion]
  • February 26, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • February 26, 2019: [Objection - not to motion]
  • February 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 26, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • January 07, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • December 12, 2018: [Objection to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 28, 2018: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • November 28, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • November 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Forfeiture Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2018: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
  • October 15, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Addendum]
  • September 26, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 25, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • September 24, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 21, 2018: [Detention Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • September 18, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2018: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • September 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • September 13, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 12, 2018: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • September 12, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • September 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 10, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 10, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • September 10, 2018: [Seal Case]
  • September 10, 2018: [Indictment - Sealed Superseding]
  • September 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Objection to Motion]
  • August 27, 2018: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
  • August 16, 2018: [Suppress]
  • August 15, 2018: [Bill of Particulars]
  • August 09, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice - Other]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2018: [Objection to Motion]
  • July 24, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • July 23, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continue Trial]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 26, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 11, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 06, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 05, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 05, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 04, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 04, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.