U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shaikh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • May 06, 2020: [Exhibit]
  • May 06, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 08, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
  • October 23, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • October 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [USM Return]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 16, 2019: [Extend Time]
  • July 03, 2019: [USM Return]
  • July 01, 2019: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 20, 2019: [Collateral Returned]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 14, 2019: [Response - not to motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Objection - not to motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • June 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2019: [Trial Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • February 08, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 01, 2019: [Seal Document-Court Use]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Vacate]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 19, 2018: [Service by Publication]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 18, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Forfeiture Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 13, 2018: [Forfeiture]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 29, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 29, 2018: [Collateral Receipt]
  • June 13, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 04, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 04, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • June 04, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.