U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gingras
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 17, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 15, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 14, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 19, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 18, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 11, 2018: [Waiver of]
  • June 11, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 11, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 06, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 05, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 05, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 04, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 04, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.