U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 12, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 11, 2019: [Objection - not to motion]
  • November 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 07, 2019: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 14, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • March 13, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 07, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • February 07, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 14, 2019: [Suppress]
  • January 09, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 03, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • January 02, 2019: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • December 13, 2018: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • December 07, 2018: [Suppress]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 19, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 13, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 12, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 02, 2018: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • July 02, 2018: [Waive]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • June 27, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • June 14, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • June 11, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 04, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 04, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.