U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ervin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • June 11, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Vacate - 2241/2255 - Court Use]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Response - not to motion]
  • December 12, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2019: [Vacate - 2241/2255 - Court Use]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • August 01, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • July 31, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • April 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • December 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 10, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 29, 2018: [Continue Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 13, 2018: [Continue Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continue Trial]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 13, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 12, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 12, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 06, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 05, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 05, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 05, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.