U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Laughton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Receipt]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Collateral Returned]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 07, 2018: [Memorandum]
  • November 02, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Collateral Receipt]
  • June 21, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
  • June 21, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • June 21, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 15, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 11, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 07, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.