U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • October 29, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 28, 2019: [Request to Dismiss Probation Petition]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 19, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2019: [Bail Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • June 15, 2019: [Bail]
  • June 13, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 15, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 12, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • February 12, 2019: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • February 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.