U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruiz-Campos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 25, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 25, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 19, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • June 18, 2018: [Expedited Plea /Sentencing Hearing - Re-entry After Deporation]
  • June 14, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 14, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.