U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LNU
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 24, 2018: [Amend]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 14, 2018: [Continue Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 20, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • July 16, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 22, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 14, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.