U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pintos-Mieres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Combined Change of Plea and Sentencing - Re-entry After Deportation]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • July 09, 2018: [Expedited Plea /Sentencing Hearing - Re-entry After Deporation]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • June 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2018: [Bail]
  • June 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • June 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 22, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 18, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 18, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 18, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 18, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.