U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weeden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Recommendation for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • April 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
  • December 14, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2018: [Administrative Closure]
  • December 14, 2018: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 14, 2018: [LASER - Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 03, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • August 01, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Collateral Receipt]
  • June 21, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 21, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 21, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 20, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 20, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 20, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.