U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weeks et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Receipt of Exhibits]
  • August 23, 2021: [Return of Exhibits]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • July 13, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • July 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • April 20, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 23, 2021: [Vacate]
  • March 22, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 08, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 03, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • March 02, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 06, 2020: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 03, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2020: [Sentencing Letter/Impact Statement - Public]
  • September 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Response - not to motion]
  • August 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 27, 2020: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 22, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 16, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 02, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 29, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • August 26, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • August 08, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • July 08, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 02, 2019: [Continue Trial]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 27, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 27, 2019: [Administrative Closure]
  • June 27, 2019: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 27, 2019: [LASER - Notice]
  • June 21, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 07, 2019: [Continue Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 26, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 25, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • February 25, 2019: [Bail Hearing]
  • February 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 12, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • February 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 29, 2019: [Continue Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 21, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 06, 2018: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • November 02, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 22, 2018: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • October 22, 2018: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 14, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 14, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 05, 2018: [Clerk's Notice-Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 06, 2018: [Detention]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • July 16, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 06, 2018: [Motion Referred]
  • July 06, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 21, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 21, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 20, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 20, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 20, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 20, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.