U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [Recommendation for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Recommendation for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Collateral Returned]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
  • November 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 15, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 14, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2020: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 09, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Collateral Receipt]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Collateral Returned]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • February 14, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 14, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 14, 2019: [Administrative Closure]
  • February 14, 2019: [Case Reassigned]
  • February 14, 2019: [LASER - Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • January 25, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Administrative Closure]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 25, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 25, 2019: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 25, 2019: [LASER - Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Continue Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 06, 2018: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 03, 2018: [Addendum]
  • August 02, 2018: [Continue Trial]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Collateral Receipt]
  • June 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 21, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 20, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 20, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 20, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 20, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 20, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.