U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huerta-Mata
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Combined Change of Plea and Sentencing - Re-entry After Deportation]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 26, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • June 22, 2018: [Expedited Plea /Sentencing Hearing - Re-entry After Deporation]
  • June 20, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 20, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 20, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.