U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sullivan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • January 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 22, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2018: [Bail Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • October 26, 2018: [Bail]
  • October 15, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 27, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • July 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • July 16, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 13, 2018: [Arrest]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.