U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carpenter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.