U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lindsey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Receipt of Exhibits]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • February 23, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • February 10, 2021: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • February 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2021: [Objection to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
  • January 11, 2021: [Extend Time]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Extend Time]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 19, 2020: [Extend Time]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 20, 2020: [Transcript - Jury Selection]
  • February 11, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 28, 2020: [Clerks Supplemental Certificate]
  • January 28, 2020: [Transcript]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Appellate Case Number]
  • November 13, 2019: [Clerks Certificate/Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 13, 2019: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • October 29, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 29, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 28, 2019: [Addendum]
  • October 25, 2019: [Response - not to motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 16, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 12, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • April 18, 2019: [JERS Certification of Exhibits]
  • April 18, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 17, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • April 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • April 17, 2019: [Jury Selection]
  • April 16, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 15, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 14, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 12, 2019: [Witness List]
  • April 12, 2019: [Jury Selection List]
  • April 09, 2019: [JERS Statement]
  • April 09, 2019: [Witness List]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 08, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • April 05, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • April 05, 2019: [Witness List]
  • April 03, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 03, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 01, 2019: [In Limine]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 04, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 04, 2019: [Waiver of]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • February 22, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 30, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 30, 2019: [Waiver of]
  • January 18, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • January 10, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • January 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 02, 2019: [Suppress]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 21, 2018: [Continue Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 28, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • August 23, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 10, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 10, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 29, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 29, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 28, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 28, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 28, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.