U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Austin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Vacate - 2241/2255 - Court Use]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • December 06, 2020: [Addendum]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Response - not to motion]
  • November 20, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2020: [Set Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 14, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [CJA 24 Payment Information]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Transcript]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Transcript]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Clerks Supplemental Certificate]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2019: [Appellate Case Number]
  • December 06, 2019: [Clerks Certificate/Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 06, 2019: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 05, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2019: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • December 04, 2019: [Leave to File]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Sentencing Letter/Impact Statement - Public]
  • November 20, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Transcript]
  • August 05, 2019: [Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 23, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • May 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 14, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 08, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • January 02, 2019: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Suppress]
  • December 10, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 02, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • October 04, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 26, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 26, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • September 25, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 25, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 14, 2018: [Continue Trial]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 02, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 29, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 28, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 28, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 28, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.