U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • February 08, 2019: [Response - not to motion]
  • February 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • October 24, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 22, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • October 16, 2018: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • October 01, 2018: [Clerk's Notice-Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continue Trial]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 30, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • July 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • July 05, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 05, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 28, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 28, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 28, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 28, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 28, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.