U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perra et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 23, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2023: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • January 18, 2023: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 17, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 17, 2023: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • January 17, 2023: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arrest]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 20, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
  • November 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 19, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
  • November 14, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Response - not to motion]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 05, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 03, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 01, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • July 12, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 10, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice - Show Cause Hearing Regarding Indictment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 10, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.