U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ma
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Amend]
  • June 06, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • May 03, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2019: [Service by Publication]
  • April 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 09, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 01, 2019: [Collateral Receipt]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 28, 2019: [Vacate]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 06, 2019: [Forfeiture]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 27, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 26, 2018: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • November 26, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 13, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 22, 2018: [Continue Trial]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • July 30, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 30, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 24, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 13, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.