U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benoit
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Mandate]
  • September 21, 2020: [Mandate]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order - Sealed]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 06, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 21, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 13, 2019: [Appellate Case Number]
  • May 10, 2019: [Clerks Certificate/Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 10, 2019: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • May 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 06, 2019: [Response - not to motion]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 08, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • April 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • April 01, 2019: [Bifurcate]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • November 01, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • October 30, 2018: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • October 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 16, 2018: [Continue Trial]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 13, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 13, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 13, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 13, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.