U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torrey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 23, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 13, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 09, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Sentencing Letter/Impact Statement - Public]
  • May 21, 2019: [Sentencing Letter/Impact Statement - Public]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 20, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2018: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • September 05, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • August 23, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • August 20, 2018: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Protective Order]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Detention Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2018: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • July 13, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 13, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 13, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 13, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • July 13, 2018: [Seal Case]
  • July 13, 2018: [Indictment - Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.