U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stram
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 05, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Request to Dismiss Probation Petition]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2020: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • August 23, 2018: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • August 21, 2018: [Request to Dismiss Probation Petition]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 30, 2018: [Bail Hearing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • July 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 18, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 16, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 16, 2018: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.