U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:97-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • April 01, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • December 10, 2019: [Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 16, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 06, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 20, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • August 06, 2019: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 26, 2018: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • October 10, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • September 07, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 07, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 06, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 06, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 05, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 05, 2018: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Warrant]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.