U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stratton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 11, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • February 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2019: [Downward Departure]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 31, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • August 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 17, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.