U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MacDonald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • December 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 03, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continue Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 16, 2018: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • October 01, 2018: [Clerk's Notice-Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 12, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 10, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 26, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 26, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.