U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sfara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • May 10, 2019: [Return of Property]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 01, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 13, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 13, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 06, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 30, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 30, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 26, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 26, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 26, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.